Friday, June 8, 2012

Multiplication of two ADJACENT NUMBERS

Follow the following Steps:
Step1: Square the First number
Step 2: Add that number in Square

Example:

11*12= Square of first number + first number
121 11 = 132

12*13= 144+12= 156
13*14= 169+13= 182
14*15= 196+14= 210
15*16= 225+15= 240



No comments:

Post a Comment