**STEP 1:**Square of the first digit of the greater number

**STEP 2**: Substract 1 from Square

**STEP 3**: Add 75 in last

**Example:**

25*35= Square of the first digit(3^2=9) of the greater number(35) - 1 = 8

and then 75.=. 875

35*45 = 4^2-1 = 16-1 =1575

15*25 = 2^2-1 = 3 =375

35*45 = 4^2-1 = 15 =1575

55*65 = 6^2-1 = 35 =3575

25*35= Square of the first digit(3^2=9) of the greater number(35) - 1 = 8

ReplyDeleteand then 75.=. 875

35*45 = 4^2-1 = 16-1 =1575

15*25 = 2^2-1 = 3 =375

35*45 = 4^2-1 = 15 =1575

55*65 = 6^2-1 = 35 =3575

same way for 3 digits

Example:115*125 first 2 digits of greater number 12 multiply with same digits(12*12) =144 - 1 = 143 and then 75 = 14375

Thank you for your post.Easyshiksha is education websites in india.

ReplyDeleteIt provides online courses in india with free distance learning .It provides free online test series for ibps mock test